EP2660965 - ELECTRIC POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 1-1 Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 02 /
AJIMA, Toshiyuki c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 1-1 Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10861318.3 | 27.12.2010 | WO2010JP07537 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012090237 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2660965 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H02M7/48 (EP,US);
H02P27/06 (US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | STROMWANDLER | [2013/45] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER CONVERTER | [2013/45] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | Translation filed | 29.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 09.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11299264 (SYSTEM GIKEN KK); | [Y]JP2000116120 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000166251 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006311697 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2008220001 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2009254196 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000295857 |