EP2354730 - Improved cooling unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondial Group S.R.L. Strada Pasigliano 15 15020 San Giorgio Monferrato AL / IT | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fossati, Claudio Mondial Group S.R.L. Strada Pasigliano 15 15020 San Giorgio Monferrato (AL) / IT | 02 /
Gallinotti, Marco Mondial Group S.R.L. Strada Pasigliano 15 15020 San Giorgio Monferrato (AL) / IT | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11000411.6 | 20.01.2011 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | IT2010TO00056 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: IT TO20100056 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2354730 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2354730 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25D19/02 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
F25D19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kühleinheit | [2011/32] | English: | Improved cooling unit | [2011/32] | French: | Installation frigorifique | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 26.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | Public notification(s) | Communication pursuant to Rule 142 EPC (Resumption of proceedings under Rule 142(2) EPC dated 25.09.2023) | Mondial Group S.R.L. Strada Pasigliano 15 15020 San Giorgio Monferrato AL / IT | [2023/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.03.2024 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 07.04.2017 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2018/39] | 01.03.2024 | Resumption of proceedings | [2023/37] | 07.04.2017 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2006296928 (COCA COLA CO, et al) [X] 1 * figure 4 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]JP2002345607 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * figure 4 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]JPH08110144 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-4 | by applicant | DE202005016871U |