EP2479741 - Presentation device for posters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tralau, Dierk Elsässer Strasse 6 23564 Lübeck / DE | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Groth, Wieland Patentanwalt Zippelhaus 4 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Groth, Wieland Schopenstehl 22 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000414.0 | 20.01.2011 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479741 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/26, G09F11/15 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
G09F11/15 (EP);
G09F11/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Präsentationsvorrichtung für Plakate | [2012/30] | English: | Presentation device for posters | [2012/30] | French: | Dispositif de présentation pour affiches | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9734283 (REGEN HOWARD W [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 9, line 6 - line 26 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 16 * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]GB2303239 (HIGH ROAD ADVERTISING LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 29 - line 37 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE2115414 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2238417 (HAZEL GROVE MUSIC CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 2 - line 11 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE10152440 |