EP2487374 - Method and system for setting a self-tapping undercut anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UIP GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 5 63814 Mainaschaff / DE | [2016/03] |
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states uip Universal Innovative Products GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 5 63814 Mainaschaff / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Göttlich, Harald Natelsheideweg 109 A 30900 Wedemark / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göttlich, Harald Natelsheideweg 109a 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/25] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2012/46] | Thürer, Andreas, et al Thürer und Nitz Goldbacher Strasse 14 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000567.5 | 25.01.2011 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487374 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487374 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/08 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
F16B13/0816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2012/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Setzen eines selbstschneidenden Hinterschnittankers | [2012/33] | English: | Method and system for setting a self-tapping undercut anchor | [2012/33] | French: | Procédé et système de fixation d'une ancre contre-dépouillée auto-taraudeuse | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 22.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees MC, DK, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 05.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2011 | AL | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | MT | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | BE | 31.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.01.2011 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.01.2011 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009214315 (KELLY DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 11 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1,7,8,10 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 12-16; | [Y]US2002189866 (SATO YOSHINORI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0132]; figures 13,14 *; | [XI]EP1357302 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * [I] 12-16 | by applicant | - Qualification of Post-Installed Mechanlcal Anchors In Concrete and Commentary, AMENEAN CONCRETE INSTITUTES, (200706), pages 247 - 2 |