EP2363628 - Coupling element for connecting the ends of two tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORMA Germany GmbH Edisonstrasse 4 63277 Maintal / DE | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Andreas Rheinstraße 55 63477 Maintal / DE | 02 /
Chateau, Jérôme 127 rue de Vallières 57070 Metz / FR | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000601.2 | 26.01.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | DE20101010463 | 06.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010010463 | DE20101015157 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015157 | [2011/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363628 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363628 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/07, F16K24/06, F24D19/08 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
F16L55/07 (EP,US);
F16K24/04 (KR);
F16K24/06 (EP,US);
F16K25/02 (KR);
F16K27/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kupplungselement zum Verbinden zweier Rohrenden | [2011/36] | English: | Coupling element for connecting the ends of two tubes | [2011/36] | French: | Elément de couplage pour la liaison de deux extrémités de tuyaux | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2467217 (LAWRENCE MIKESKA PETER) [X] 1,2,6-10 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 63; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2723676 (THRUSH MARQUIS O) [X] 1,6-8 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 19; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0989328 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 12-14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1691119 (WATTS IND ITALIA SRL [IT]) [A] 12-16* paragraph [0022]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP1906070 (HEFFERNAN JOHN FRANCIS STEEPLE [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,11 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0058] - [0063]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2008115843 (WANG CHI-CHANG [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 3-6 * |