EP2362480 - Battery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yoshihiro c/o Intellectual Property H.Q. SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan Hondori, 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000752.3 | 31.01.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | JP20100041981 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010041981 | JP20100141463 | 22.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010141463 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2362480 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2362480 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H02J7/02 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H01M10/441 (EP,US);
H01M10/443 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H02J7/0018 (EP,US);
H01M10/448 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Batteriesystem | [2011/35] | English: | Battery system | [2011/35] | French: | Système de batteries | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6373223 (ANZAWA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 7, line 3 - line 53 ** column 10, line 15 - line 49; figures 5,6 *; | [I]WO2007145464 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 7, line 14 - page 15, line 18 * * figures 2-5 *; | [I]WO2008097033 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-3,5 * page 8, line 19 - page 11, line 13 *; | [I]WO2008097031 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 20 * * page 10, line 19 - page 10, line 24 * * page 11, line 19 - line 23 * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]WO2009051413 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 23 * * page 16, line 4 - line 14 * * page 17, line 1 - line 8 * | by applicant | JPH11234916 |