EP2484229 - Liquid seasoning, beverages, method of seasoning food, and seasoned food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Project Japan Inc. 4-1 Nakanomihominami 1-chome Izumo-shi Shimane / JP | For all designated states Tadashi Kishimoto 6-11 Shikigaoka 1-chome Hatsukaichi-shi Hiroshima / JP | For all designated states Seijitsumura Inc. 1172-2 Aza-Tawatshiotsu Niiya Ozu-shi Ehime / JP | For all designated states Nakamoto Shoji Inc. 18-9 Yamane-cho Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Yoshirou 7-7, Nishishinmachi 3-chome Izumu-shi Shimane / JP | 02 /
Iwanaga, Mitsuhiko 35-6, Kor Makishima-cho Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Toshiko 927-1, Enya-cho Izumo-shi Shimane / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11000971.9 | 07.02.2011 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484229 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/221, A23L2/54, A23L2/02, A23L1/0528, A23L1/238, A23L1/40, A23L1/48, A23C9/152, A23C11/10, A23L1/314, A23L1/32, A23L1/333, B01F3/04, B01F5/12 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A23C9/1524 (EP);
A23C11/103 (EP,US);
A23L11/65 (EP,US);
A23L13/428 (EP);
A23L15/30 (EP);
A23L19/03 (EP);
A23L19/115 (EP);
A23L2/02 (EP);
A23L2/54 (EP);
A23L23/10 (EP);
A23L27/10 (EP);
A23L27/50 (EP);
A23L35/00 (EP);
B01F23/23231 (EP);
B01F25/103 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/101 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssiges Würzmittel, Getränke, Verfahren zum Würzen von Lebensmitteln und gewürztes Lebensmittel | [2012/32] | English: | Liquid seasoning, beverages, method of seasoning food, and seasoned food | [2012/32] | French: | Assaisonnement liquide, boissons, procédé d'assaisonnement d'aliments et aliments assaisonnés | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2005287481 ; | [XAI]JP2010167365 ; | [XI]JP2009044988 ; | [A]JP2007097520 ; | [A]JP2004229526 ; | [XAI]EP0963784 (OHNARI HIROFUMI [JP]) [X] 10 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 16 * [A] 1-9 [I] 16-18; | [XAI]EP1112773 (OHNARI HIROFUMI [JP]) [X] 10 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 2a * [A] 1-9 [I] 16-18; | JP3397154B [ ] (ONARI HIROBUMI); | [A]US2006204642 (ADAMS LESLIE N [US], et al) [A] 1-9* example 2 *; | JP4420161B [ ]; | [XA]EP2213180 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [X] 10 * paragraph [0019]; claims 1, 3 * [A] 16-18; | JP4525890B [ ] (ONARI HIROBUMI); | [XAI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 73, Database accession no. 2005-708941, XP002643351 & JP2005287481 A 20051020 (KANGAE SHOJI KK) [X] 1,4,5,9 * abstract * [A] 16-18 [I] 2,3,6-8 | [XAI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 54, Database accession no. 2010-K03424, XP002643352 & JP2010167365 A 20100805 (NAGA INT KK) [X] 10 * abstract * [A] 16-18 [I] 1-9 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 19, Database accession no. 2009-F61722, XP002643353 & JP2009044988 A 20090305 (ITOKAZU M) [X] 10 * abstract * [I] 16-18 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 31, Database accession no. 2007-318426, XP002643354 & JP2007097520 A 20070419 (SHIRADE S) [A] 1-9,16-18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 56, Database accession no. 2004-576260, XP002643355 & JP2004229526 A 20040819 (MITSUKAN GROUP HONSHA KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05316966 | JPH10136943 | JPH118952 | JP2851997B | JP2002354988 | JP2003079328 | JP3397154B | JP2003174850 | JP2009125067 | JP2010022955 | JP4420161B | JP4525890B |