EP2363906 - Wireless rechargeable battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coretronic Corporation No.11, Li Hsing Road Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu Hsin chu / TW | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yin, Nan-Jiun c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsing Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
Tsai, Ming-Lung c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsing Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu / TW | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Wagner, Bernhard Peter, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001309.1 | 17.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | CN20102132361U | 26.02.2010 Original published format: CN 201020132361 U | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363906 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/44, H01M2/20 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H01M10/4257 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/0029 (EP,US);
H02J7/0036 (EP);
H02J7/0034 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drahtlos wiederaufladbare Batterie | [2011/36] | English: | Wireless rechargeable battery | [2011/36] | French: | Batterie rechargeable sans fil | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002113572 (ZINK UWE [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0026] , [0027] *; | [X]US2007222681 (GREENE CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] *; | [X]US2009261778 (KOOK YOON-SANG [KR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0087] * |