EP2363295 - Recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Takatoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Asakawa, Hiroshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nagashima, Hitoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001427.1 | 21.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | JP20100046402 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010046402 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363295 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363295 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/50 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M5/50 (KR);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41M2205/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2011/36] | English: | Recording medium | [2011/36] | French: | Support d'enregistrement | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 02.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2011 | AL | 04.12.2013 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MK | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | RS | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | SM | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 21.02.2014 | LU | 21.02.2014 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.02.2011 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2014 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3237381 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1138513 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002012629 (YOSHINO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2005138403 | JP2004167959 | JPH07232473 | JPH08132731 | JPH0966664 | JPH0976628 | JPH0516015B |