EP2362463 - Power source apparatus with electrical components disposed in the battery blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asai, Yasuhiro Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
Nishihara, Yoshitomo Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
Ohkura, Kazumi Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 04 /
Miyazaki, Yutaka Intellectual Property H.Q. Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Hertz, Oliver v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001466.9 | 22.02.2011 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | JP20100036862 | 23.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010036862 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2362463 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2362463 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362463 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M10/48, H01M10/50 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/617 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/652 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/653 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6554 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6566 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6568 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/15 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/284 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/512 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/569 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/35] | Title | German: | Stromquellenvorrichtung mit in den Batterieblöcken angeordneten elektrischen Komponenten | [2011/35] | English: | Power source apparatus with electrical components disposed in the battery blocks | [2011/35] | French: | Appareil de source d'alimentation avec composants électriques disposés dans les bloc-batteries | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 05.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2011 | AL | 20.11.2013 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MK | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | RS | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | SM | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IE | 22.02.2014 | LU | 22.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MK | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
SM | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RS | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006068383 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [I] 1-5,7 * page 14, line 15 - page 16, line 22 *; | [I]WO2008038916 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 11, line 13 - line 16 * * figures 1,8,9 *; | [I]EP2099085 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0031] *; | [E]WO2011024477 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [E] 1-7 * abstract * * the whole document ** figures 1-3,5,8,13,14,21 * | by applicant | JP2010015949 |