EP2348321 - System and methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifying analytes within samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Christopher, Brandon 10538 Moorland Heights Way San Diego CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Heinz, Robert, E. 5625 Guincho Court San Diego CA 92124 / US | 03 /
Knight, Bryon, J. 4481 Palo Verde Terrace San Diego CA 92115 / US | 04 /
Lair, Gary, D. 2388 Vancouver Avenue San Diego CA 92104 / US | 05 /
Li, Florence, F. 13653 Tiverton Road San Diego CA 92130 / US | 06 /
Li, Haito 5055 Caminito Exquisito San Diego CA 92130 / US | 07 /
Macioszek, Jerzy, A. 9107 Jones Mill Road Chevy Chase MD 20815 / US | 08 /
Nguyen, Thanh, N. 11829 Westview Parkway San Diego CA 92126 / US | 09 /
Scalese, Robert, F. 2829 Glenview Way Escondido CA 92025 / US | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Script IP Limited Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome, Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/30] | Lloyd, John Scott Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11001533.6 | 10.03.2006 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | US20050659874P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 659874 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2348321 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2348321 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, G01N35/00, G01N35/04, B01L7/00, C12Q1/68, G01N21/64, G01N21/76, G01N35/10 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851 (EP,US);
G01N21/6454 (US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
G01N35/00693 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
G01N35/026 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (US);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00346 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00356 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00524 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0097 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0441 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0443 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0444 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0455 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0491 (EP,US);
G01N2035/103 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0415 (EP,US);
Y10S435/808 (EP,US);
Y10S435/809 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2537/165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | G01N35/02, G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Durchführung von Tests zum Nachweis oder zur Quantifizierung von Analyten in Proben | [2011/30] | English: | System and methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifying analytes within samples | [2011/30] | French: | Système et procédés pour effectuer des analyses afin de détecter ou quantifier des analytes dans des échantillons | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/23] | 28.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737943.8 / EP1861721 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060737943) is 26.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002014443 (HANSEN TIMOTHY ROY [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0037] , [0039] , [0043] - [0045]; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US2002131895 (GJERDINGEN DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0028]; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,3 *; | [YA]US2002137194 (AMMANN KELLY G [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,20 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0288] , [0338]; figures 4,22,24,25 *[A] 2; | [Y]US2004033518 (WITTWER CARL T [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0014] , [0023]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4486539 | US4681840 | US4683195 | US4751177 | US4766062 | US4851330 | US4946958 | US4950613 | US5130238 | US5185439 | US5200314 | EP0547267 | US5231015 | US5234809 | US5288609 | US5399491 | US5427930 | US5455166 | US5476774 | US5539082 | US5541308 | US5585481 | US5612200 | US5635352 | US5639599 | US5639604 | US5756709 | US5780224 | US5804375 | US5827656 | US5837452 | US5846701 | US5849478 | US5925517 | US5928862 | US5958700 | US5994056 | US6031091 | US6066458 | US6086827 | US6150097 | US6232079 | US6361945 | US2002055116 | US6410278 | US2003036058 | US6534273 | US6541205 | US6649749 | US6691041 | US2004235138 | US2004259108 | US6849412 | US6893612 | US6911327 | US2005202491 | US2005282170 | US2006046265 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 | - MAHONY ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 3122 - 3126 | - AL-SOUD, J. CLIN. MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 485 - 493 | - WEUSTEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, no. 6E26, pages 1 - 7 | US20040825757 | US20050672609 | US20050693455 | US20050737334 |