EP2372267 - Support for solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envalue GmbH Gewerbepark Garham 6 94544 Hofkirchen / DE | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haslinger, Rüdiger Am Steinfeld 3 94496 Ortenburg / DE | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Bahnhofstrasse 5 94315 Straubing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | advotec. Bahnhofstrasse 5 94315 Straubing / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001880.1 | 07.03.2011 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | DE20101010696 | 08.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010010696 | [2011/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372267 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2372267 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F24S25/11 (EP);
F24S25/16 (EP);
F24S2080/012 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haltegestell für Solarmodule | [2011/40] | English: | Support for solar modules | [2011/40] | French: | Support pour modules solaires | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009255530 (GUNTER CHARLES E [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-10; | [X]DE3247468 (IMCHEMIE KUNSTSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9118238 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 24; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE10102583 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,11 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102008027300 (REV RENEWABLE ENERGY VENTURES [CH]) [Y] 3,4,8,10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2009120923 (PANELCLAW INC [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * page 5, line 3 - page 15, line 16; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]JPS5812960 (TAKAHASHI TAKASHI) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102008004179 (METZGER HERBERT H W [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 1a; claim 9 *; | [A]DE202009003167U (HASLINGER RUEDIGER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |