EP2498556 - Timing advance configuration for multiple uplink component carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feuersänger, Martin c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Löhr, Joachim c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Wengerter, Christian c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11001914.8 | 08.03.2011 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498556 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
H04W56/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zeitvorlaufkonfiguration für mehrfache Aufwärtsverbindungskomponententräger | [2012/37] | English: | Timing advance configuration for multiple uplink component carriers | [2012/37] | French: | Configuration avancée de synchronisation pour plusieurs supports de composants de liaison montante | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HUAWEI, "Different Timing Advance Impact on Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-095815 DIFFERENT TIMING ADVANCE IMPACT ON CARRIER AGGREGATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091012), no. Miyazaki; 20091012, XP050390299 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 2; figures 2,3 * [I] 2-15 | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Reference DL CC for TA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-103221, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG2, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050423303 [Y] 2-15 * page 1 - page 2 * | [Y] - ERICSSON AND ST-ERICSSON, "Text proposal for CA BS TR: Time alignment between carriers", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-102578, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100623), vol. RAN WG4, no. Bratislava; 20100628, XP050454731 [Y] 2-15 * page 2 - page 5; figures 1-5 * | [A] - RAN WG4, "Reply LS on multiple timing advance for inter-band CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-103296(R4-101477), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100507), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420399 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - ERIK DAHLMANN ET AL, 3GEvolution: HSPA and LTE for Mobile Broadband, passage, 3G EVOLUTION : HSPA AND LTE FOR MOBILE BROADBAND, ACADEMIC PRESS IN ELSEVIER, NL, PAGE(S) 490 - 495, (20080601), ISBN 978-0-12-374538-5, XP002591334 [T] 1-15 | [Y] - HUAWEI, "Multiple Timing Advance Impact on RAN2", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-100110 MULTIPLE TIMING ADVANCE IMPACT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20100118, XP050420934 [Y] 2-15 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-3; table 1 * |