EP2359837 - Poly-tlr antagonist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej-Dholka Road Bhat, Ahmedabad 382 210 GUJ / IN | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Modi, Indravaden Ambalal Cadila Pharmaceuticals Limited "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej-Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad Gujarat / IN | 02 /
Khamar, Bakulesh Mafatial Cadila Pharmaceuticals Limited "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej-Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad Gujarat / IN | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Rigby, Barbara Nicole Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11002055.9 | 21.11.2007 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | ININ19312006 | 23.11.2006 Original published format: IN IN19312006 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359837 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (EP,GB,US);
A61K39/04 (GB);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/44] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Poly-TLR-Antagonist | [2011/34] | English: | Poly-tlr antagonist | [2011/34] | French: | Antagoniste poly-tlr | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07825710.2 / EP2096914 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070825710) is 04.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03075827 (KHAMAR BAKULESH MAFATLAL [IN], et al); | [E]WO2008114119 (CADILA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN], et al); | by applicant | US5681824 | WO2004071465 |