EP2340768 - Ultrasound endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imahashi, Takuya c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuhiro c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Yukihiko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 04 /
Mizunuma, Akiko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 05 /
Aoki, Hidemichi c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 06 /
Sato, Sunao c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Imahashi, Takuya c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuhiro c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
Sawada, Yukihiko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
Mizunuma, Akiko c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
05 /
Aoki, Hidemichi c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
06 /
Sato, Sunao c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11002307.4 | 29.12.2005 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | JP20050031132 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005031132 | JP20050225571 | 03.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005225571 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340768 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2340768 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/005, A61B8/00, A61B8/12 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
A61B1/0055 (EP,US);
A61B1/00071 (EP,US);
A61B1/00094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00114 (EP,US);
A61B1/00119 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | A61B8/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/52] |
Former [2011/27] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL ENDOSKOP | [2015/32] | English: | Ultrasound endoscope | [2011/27] | French: | ENDOSCOPE A ULTRASONS | [2015/32] |
Former [2011/27] | Ultraschall Endoskop | ||
Former [2011/27] | Endoscope à ultrasons | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 21.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05822706.7 / EP1849414 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050822706) is 06.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.03.2016 | [2017/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002062084 (OHARA KENICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [0055] - [0058]; figures 1,10 *; | [A]US4934340 (EBLING WENDEL V [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 19; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9932918 (MICRUS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2002062084 | WO9932918 | US5476497 |