EP2340725 - Methods for the use of branched chain amino acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenberg, Norman Alan 3516 Flag Avenue North New Hope, MN 55427 / US | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Paula-Marie Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Stephen, Paula-Marie Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2012/40] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11002605.1 | 26.10.2006 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | US20050731450P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731450 P | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340725 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A61K38/05, C07K5/06 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methoden zur Verwendung von verzweigten Aminosäuren | [2011/28] | English: | Methods for the use of branched chain amino acids | [2011/27] | French: | Méthodes d'emploi d'acides aminés à chaîne ramifiée | [2011/27] |
Former [2011/27] | Methoden zur verwendung von verzweigten aminosäuren | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/20] | 08.04.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.06.2014 | 24.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06836521.2 / EP1940252 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060836521) is 22.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5034377 (ADIBI SIAMAK A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * column 6; claim 1 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3; table 1 * [Y] 9,11-13,16; | [XY]US2003198617 (GREEN LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,14,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032]; claims 1,14,16 * * paragraph [0012] * [Y] 3,9,11-13,16; | [XY]WO2004078780 (PEPHARM R & D LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,14,15 * page 2, line 13 - line 15; claims 1-9 * [Y] 3,9,11-13,16; | [XP]EP1591116 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-5,7-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; claim 3 *; | [E]EP1941896 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0038]; examples 4,6; claims 1-6; tables 1,3 *; | [XYI] - BAUTISTA J ET AL, "Sunflower protein hydrolysates for dietary treatment of patients with liver failure", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20000201), vol. 77, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11746-000-0020-X, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 121 - 126, XP002465306 [X] 1,2,5-8,14,15 * abstract * * page 121, right column, last full paragraph; page 125, left column, first full paragraph-right column, last full paragraph * [Y] 3,9,11-13,16 [I] 4,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-000-0020-x |