EP2438865 - Electro-mechanical surgical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitman, Michael P. 1544 River Road New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 02 /
Burbank, John E. 106 Haviland Road Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 03 /
Zeichner, David A. 7 Wychwood Lane Oxford, CT 06478 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11002781.0 | 28.11.2001 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | US20000723715 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 723715 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2438865 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2438865 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/068 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00323 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2905 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (US);
A61B2017/2943 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US);
A61B2017/32113 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2059 (EP,US);
A61B2034/301 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | A61B17/00, A61B17/068, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2012/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektromechanische chirurgische Vorrichtung | [2012/15] | English: | Electro-mechanical surgical device | [2012/15] | French: | Dispositif chirurgical électromécanique | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 08.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01998261.0 / EP1345535 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010998261) is 02.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4705038 (SJOSTROM DOUGLAS D [US], et al) [XD] 39-63 * the whole document *; | [X]US5876325 (MIZUNO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 39-63 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0947167 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 39-63 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9808445 (STORZ INSTR CO [US]) [A] 39-63 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4705038 | US4995877 | US5249683 | US5383880 | US5395033 | US5467911 | US5518163 | US5518164 | US5667517 | US5653374 | US5779130 | US5954259 | US19990324451 | US19990324452 | US19990351534 | US20000510926 | US20000510927 | US20000510931 | US20000510932 | US20000510933 | US20000510923 |