EP2388529 - Apparatus and method for controlling thermal systems, namely radiant systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORTOLASO, Claudio VIA CIGNO 113 45021 BADIA POLESINE (RO) / IT | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11003006.1 | 11.04.2011 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | IT2010VI00106 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: IT VI20100106 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388529 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
F24D3/1075 (EP);
F24D19/1033 (EP,US);
F24D19/1015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung von Wärmesystemen, und zwar Strahlersystemen | [2011/47] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling thermal systems, namely radiant systems | [2011/47] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle de systèmes thermiques, à savoir des systèmes radiants | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5707007 (FIEDRICH JOACHIM [US]) [X] 1 * column 14, line 35 - column 15, line 22; figure 8 * [A] 6; | [X]EP1065447 (RBM SPA [IT]) [X] 1* paragraphs [0021] - [0025] *; | [X]WO2008056162 (MICROGEN ENERGY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 6-9 * page 1, line 3 - line 11; figures 1,2 * |