EP2366350 - Spinal stabilization system insertion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/38] | Spinal stabilization system insertion and methods | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Spine, Inc. 7375 Bush Lake Road Minneapolis, MN 55439-2027 / US | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landry, Michael 12602 Brightside Austin TX 78729 / US | 02 /
Khoo, Larry T. 12144 Laurel Terrace Drive Studio City CA 91604 / US | 03 /
Wagner, Erik J. 16920 Squaw Valley Lane Austin TX 78717 / US | 04 /
Forton, Charles R. 13125 Troops Trail Austin TX 78727 / US | 05 /
Jones, Robert J. 13125 Troops Trail Austin TX 78727 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003218.2 | 30.10.2003 | [2011/38] | Priority number, date | US20020422455P | 30.10.2002 Original published format: US 422455 P | US20030466091P | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 466091 P | US20030471254P | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 471254 P | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2366350 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2366350 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366350 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/16, A61B17/17, A61B17/88 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/1604 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/1703 (US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
A61B17/701 (EP,US);
A61B17/7011 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7035 (EP,US);
A61B17/708 (EP,US);
A61B17/7082 (EP,US);
A61B17/7083 (EP,US);
A61B17/7085 (EP,US);
A61B17/7091 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B17/861 (EP,US);
A61B17/8863 (EP,US);
A61B17/8897 (EP,US);
A61B17/1655 (EP,US);
A61B17/8866 (EP,US);
A61B17/8875 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/031 (US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US);
A61B2090/061 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
Y10S606/914 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/14] |
Former [2011/38] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Spinaler Stabilisierungssystemeinsatz | [2016/51] | English: | Spinal stabilization system insertion | [2016/51] | French: | Insertion de système de stabilisation de la colonne vertébrale | [2016/51] |
Former [2011/38] | Spinaler Stabilisierungssystemeinsatz und Verfahren | ||
Former [2011/38] | Spinal stabilization system insertion and methods | ||
Former [2011/38] | Insertion de système de stabilisation de la colonne vertébrale et procédés | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03781506.5 / EP1558157 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030781506) is 07.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0128436 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12,14 * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 11; figures 1,4,6,7,8,16,17,21,23 * * page 10, lines 20-32 * * page 11, line 25 - page 14, line 22 * * page 24, lines 13-31 * [Y] 6-8; | [Y]US6251112 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [Y] 6-8 * column 5, lines 35-61; figures 3,4,8 * * column 7, lines 31-59 * * column 8, lines 23-62 *; | [Y]US5720751 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 20; figures 1,4-9,13,14 *; | [Y]US2002026193 (BARKER B THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 1-3,7 *; | [Y]US6183472 (LUTZ CHRISTIAN [DE]) [Y] 1,4,5,9,10,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2796545 (DIMSO SA [FR]) [Y] 1,4,5,9,10,13 * page 4, line 25 - page 8, line 18; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US6530929 |