EP2368508 - Endoscopic rotating electrical knife [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yutaka, Yanuma Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003697.7 | 12.08.2008 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | US20070840596 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 840596 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368508 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2368508 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (US);
A61B2018/1407 (EP,US);
A61B2018/144 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2011/39] | Title | German: | Endoskopisches drehbares Elektrischmesser | [2011/39] | English: | Endoscopic rotating electrical knife | [2011/39] | French: | Couteau endoscopique électrique à rotation | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08014370.4 / EP2025298 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080014370) is 05.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5967984 (CHU MICHAEL S H [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 3,6,23,24 * * column 7, lines 31-37 * * column 8, lines 15-51 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 2; | [Y]US2002095168 (GRIEGO JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * figures 1,2,9 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] *; | [A]US6471702 (GOTO HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-6 * * columns 3-7 *; | [A]EP1688099 (PENTAX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-6 * * columns 4-7 * | by applicant | JPH09285472 |