EP2390071 - Tilting circular saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheppach Fabrikation von Holzbearbeitungsmaschinen GmbH Günzburger Strasse 69 89335 Ichenhausen / DE | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Reinhold Muehlweg 1 86476 Langenhaslach / DE | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig, et al Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstraße 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Munk, Ludwig, et al Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstraße 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/48] | Munk, Ludwig, et al Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstraße 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003951.8 | 13.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | DE20101021523 | 26.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021523 | [2011/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390071 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390071 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/22, B27G19/02 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B27B5/224 (EP);
B27G19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Title | German: | Wippkreissäge | [2011/48] | English: | Tilting circular saw | [2011/48] | French: | Scie circulaire à bascule | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2011 | AL | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | GB | 13.05.2015 | IE | 13.05.2015 | LU | 13.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
GB | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
GB | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
GB | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
GB | 13.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 13.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1992461 (POSCH GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]GB207821 (FLEISCHEL M C L G; PIRONNEAU E L F M) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202006010777U |