EP2431807 - Device for reading in particular flexible imaging plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Dental AG Höpfigheimer Strasse 17 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoms, Michael Eichenweg 19 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Nowacek, Wilhelm Keltergasse 17 74389 Cleebronn / DE | 03 /
Philipps, Bernd Fichteweg 1 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 04 /
Mustajbegovic, Enes Sucystr. 14 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 05 /
Weber, Michael Schlehenweg 2 71576 Burgstetten / DE | 06 /
Häntsch, Herbert Wilhelm-Hauff-Str. 6 71717 Beilstein / DE | 07 /
Schilling, Petra Flösserstr. 115 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Reinhard, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Ostertag, Reinhard, et al Patentanwälte Ostertag & Partner Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004339.5 | 23.08.2006 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | DE20051046248 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046248 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431807 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/04, H04N1/04, G03B42/08 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G03B42/08 (EP,US);
G03B42/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/04 (EP,US);
H04N1/12 (KR);
H04N2201/0079 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0412 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0422 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auslesen von insbesondere flexiblen Speicherfolien | [2012/12] | English: | Device for reading in particular flexible imaging plates | [2012/12] | French: | Dispositif de lecture, notamment d'écrans photostimulables flexibles | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/47] | 18.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06777020.6 / EP1929763 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060777020) is 26.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4130274 (STANGE KLAUS K) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0071701 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [Y]US4750045 (OHARA YUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]US4973134 (FINKENZELLER JOHANN [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,15 * column 1, lines 41-46; figure 3 *; | [XY]EP0567171 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1,14,15 * column 3 - column 4; figures 2,5 * [Y] 14; | [Y]US5441251 (OHTA YASUNORI [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0841592 (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19946743 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 5,8 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 *; | [XY]JP2003156809 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1,5,7,15 * paragraphs [0047] , [0066]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7; | [Y]EP1378765 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [Y] 5,8 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [XY]US2005029475 (KATZ NOA [GB]) [X] 1,6,11,15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0045]; figures 3-5 *[Y] 6; | [XYI]WO2005052686 (NEUSHUL STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1,3,10,11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 4-9,12-14 [I] 2; | [XY]US2005167623 (YONEKAWA HISASHI [JP]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0067] , [0072] , [0117] - [0126] - [0205]; figures 1,6 * [Y] 4 |