EP2394859 - Cladding assembly for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehau AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | For:CZ
DE
ES
FR
GB
HU
IT
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Rehau AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlig, Nico Humboldtstraße 10 08529 Plauen / DE | 02 /
Jakobs, Holger In der Reute 19/2 72135 Dettenhausen / DE | [2014/13] |
Former [2011/50] | 01 /
Uhlig, Nico Humboldtstraße 10 08529 Plauen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004572.1 | 06.06.2011 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | DE20102007764U | 09.06.2010 Original published format: DE 202010007764 U | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394859 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394859 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/00, B60R19/02, F16B5/06 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
B60R13/00 (EP);
B60R19/02 (EP);
F16B5/0635 (EP);
B60R2019/1886 (EP);
B60R2019/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | Verkleiderungsanordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2011/50] | English: | Cladding assembly for a motor vehicle | [2011/50] | French: | Agencement d'habillage pour un véhicule automobile | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 14.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MK | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | RS | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | SM | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | IE | 06.06.2014 | LU | 06.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MK | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
SM | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.06.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 18.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RS | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102005021895 (DECOMA GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11,12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 * [A] 3 [I] 7,10; | [X]FR2921609 (FAURECIA BLOC AVANT [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11,12 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]EP1067025 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,11,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-4 * [I] 10; | [A]EP0761984 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1; claims 1-15 * |