EP2371455 - System and method for titrating fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/40] | System and method for filtering fluids | ||
[2016/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhn, Heinz-Gerhard Poppenbüttler Chaussee 45a 22397 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Andres, Karl-Friedrich Amselweg 33 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2011/40] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005054.9 | 29.12.2006 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | DE20061009816 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006009816 | [2011/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2371455 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2371455 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371455 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/16, G01N31/18, B01L3/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
B01L3/0234 (EP,US);
G01N31/16 (US);
G01N31/18 (EP,US);
B01L2200/023 (EP,US);
B01L2200/143 (EP,US);
B01L2300/027 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | B01L3/02, G01N31/18 | ||
Former IPC [2011/40] | B01L3/02, G01N33/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/15] |
Former [2011/40] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Titrieren von Flüssigkeiten | [2011/40] | English: | System and method for titrating fluids | [2016/24] | French: | Système et procédé destinés au titrage de liquides | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/40] | System and method for filtering fluids | Examination procedure | 24.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06027038.6 / EP1825915 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060027038) is 19.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.04.2017 | [2018/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2617346 (RADIOMETER AS) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 14 *; | [X]US4563907 (JOHNSON JR EDGAR G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 58 - column 8, line 24; figure alle *; | [X]US4821586 (SCORDATO RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 43 - column 15, line 44; figure alle *; | [A]DD267331 (HYDRIERWERK RODLEBEN VEB [DD]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 10 *; | [X]US5002737 (TERVAMAKI JUKKA [FI]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 63; figure alle *; | [X]EP0576967 (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 55 - column 6, line 43; figure alle *; | [Y]EP0657216 (EPPENDORF GERAETEBAU NETHELER [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * column 2, line 4 - column 8, line 6; figure alle *; | [Y]EP0691158 (BRAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * column 2, line 3 - column 9, line 3; figure alle *; | [A]DE19723852 (SCHOTT GERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 21 ** column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 21 *; | [Y]US2003099578 (COTE RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figure alle * | Examination | US2650256 | by applicant | EP0656229 | EP0657216 | DE20051023203 |