EP2404888 - Methanol production process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starchem Technologies, Inc. Goldbacher Strasse 36 8700 Kunsnacht / CH | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fraley, Lowell, D. 703 Santa Maria Sugar Land Texas 77478 / US | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2016/42] |
Former [2012/02] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11005297.4 | 19.01.2007 | [2012/02] | Priority number, date | US20060809260P | 30.05.2006 Original published format: US 809260 P | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404888 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2404888 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404888 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C27/00, C07C29/151 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C07C29/1518 (EP,US);
C07C27/00 (KR);
C07C29/151 (EP,US);
C07C31/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/1518, C07C31/04 (US,EP);
C07C29/151, C07C31/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2012/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methanolherstellungsverfahren | [2012/02] | English: | Methanol production process | [2012/02] | French: | Procédé de production de méthanol | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07749002.7 / EP2021309 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070749002) is 19.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | IE | 19.01.2017 | LU | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4650814 (KELLER ARNOLD P [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]GB2237287 (ENSERCH INT INVESTMENT [US]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5173513 (PINTO ALWYN [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5424335 (ABBOTT PETER E J [GB]) [Y] 1-8* the whole document *; | [I]WO0147846 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [IP]WO2006126017 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [IP] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB1159035 | GB1272798 | EP0261771 | GB2237287 | US5262443 | US5472986 | US5631302 | US5827901 | US5937631 | EP0790226 | US6191175 | US6387963 | US6730285 | US6881759 | US7019039 | AU20070064593 |