EP2543521 - Security document and method for protecting a security document against forgery and for the authentication of the security document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Central Bank Kaiserstrasse 29 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states European Central Bank Kaiserstrasse 29 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Jérôme Oberurselerstr. 23 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2013/02] | 01 /
Martin, Jérôme Egerlandstrasse 10 65760 Eschborn / DE | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Winterstrasse 2 22765 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Prinz & Partner mbB Winterstrasse 2 22765 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/43] | Prinz & Partner mbB Esplanade 31 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/02] | Pfleiderer, Bernhard, et al Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Esplanade 31 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005575.3 | 07.07.2011 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543521 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2543521 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B42D25/29, G07D7/00, G07D7/12 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
B42D25/346 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/364 (EP,US);
B42D25/391 (EP);
G07D7/128 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | B42D15/00, G07D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2013/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsdokument und Verfahren zum Schützen eines Sicherheitsdokuments gegen Fälschung und zum Authentifizieren des Sicherheitsdokuments | [2013/02] | English: | Security document and method for protecting a security document against forgery and for the authentication of the security document | [2013/02] | French: | Document de sécurité et procédé de protection d'un document de sécurité contre la falsification et pour l'authentification du document de sécurité | [2013/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2011 | AL | 23.09.2015 | BE | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | BE | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]AU2005203815 (SECURENCY INT PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1 * WPI AB -USE (§3); page 3, lines 25-32 * [I] 2-13; | [XDI]WO9852077 (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1 * line 25 - page 6, line 13; claims 1-8 * * page 9, lines 1-9 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]WO2007137334 (SECURENCY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * EPO & WPI Abstracts * * page 5, lines 8-28 * * page 12, lines 4-15 * [I] 2-13 | by applicant | WO9852077 | EP0689084 | WO9953349 | AT412078B | US5399698 |