EP2455628 - Sealing bellows with tensioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Idies, Nedal Sonnenallee 110 12045 Berlin / DE | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 11005623.1 | 08.07.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | DE20101051875 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010051875 | [2012/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2455628 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, F16J3/04, F16J15/52 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
F16C11/0671 (EP);
F16J3/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dichtungsbalg mit Spannvorrichtung | [2012/21] | English: | Sealing bellows with tensioning device | [2012/21] | French: | Soufflet d'étanchéité avec dispositif de serrage | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1953040U (GOETZEWERKE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0106153 (SACHSENRING AUTOMOBILTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6-10 * figure 5 *; | [X]DE202008012454U (MVS DYNALINK EUROP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1477649 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * figures 3-6 *; | [X]GB1000622 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006039861 |