EP2410735 - Digital radiographic imaging arrays with reduced noise [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608-1733 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tredwell, Timothy John c/o Carestream Health Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, New York 14608 / US | 02 /
Heiler, Gregory N. c/o Carestream Health Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, New York 14608 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11005914.4 | 19.07.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | US20100840518 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 840518 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2410735 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2410735 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, H04N5/357, H04N5/361, H04N5/369, H04N5/372, H04N5/353, H04N5/235 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H04N5/32 (EP,KR,US);
G01N23/04 (KR);
G01T1/20 (KR);
H01L27/14663 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/60 (US);
H04N25/63 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | H04N5/32, H04N5/357, H04N5/361 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitale radiographische Abbildungsanordnungen mit verringertem Rauschen | [2012/04] | English: | Digital radiographic imaging arrays with reduced noise | [2012/04] | French: | Réseaux d'imagerie radiographique numérique avec bruit réduit | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06105069 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]EP0813339 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]EP1378942 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [XYI]WO2009011465 (CANON KK [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4293877 | US6034406 |