EP2564996 - A method of generating a hole or recess or well in an electrically insulating or semiconducting substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Christian Zelglistrasse 30 6390 Engelberg, Obwalden / CH | 02 /
Dittmann, Leander Pl. du Vallon 18 1005 Lausanne, Vaud / CH | 03 /
Chaize, Adrien Verger l'Ecuyer 11 2068 Hauterive, Neuchatel / CH | 04 /
Hoyer, Svend Ch. de Champs-Fleuri 20 1022 Chavannes-près-Renens, Vaud / CH | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007084.4 | 31.08.2011 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564996 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00, B26F1/28, B23K26/38, B23K26/40, H01L21/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B23K26/389 (EP,US);
B23K26/38 (KR);
H05K3/0085 (US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B26D5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/28 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Lochs oder einer Aussparung oder eines Wells in einem elektrisch isolierenden oder halbleitenden Substrat | [2013/10] | English: | A method of generating a hole or recess or well in an electrically insulating or semiconducting substrate | [2013/10] | French: | Procédé de génération d'orifice, enclave ou puits dans un substrat à isolation électrique ou semi-conducteur | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2141869 (FRITZ KONIG) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2678373 (SURAN JEROME J) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2203313 (GESTETNER LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1603515 (MOLINS LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10328937 (GROSSE WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2009059786 (PICODRILL SA [CH], et al) [YD] 1-10 * page 1 - page 25; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2011042132 (DITTMANN LEANDER [CH]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-9c *; | [YD]WO2011038788 (PICODRILL SA [CH], et al) [YD] 1-10 * page 1 - page 18; figures 1-11B *; | [Y] - Bo Hanus, "Grundbausteine der Elektronik", Bo Hanus, Bo Hanus, Der leichte Einstieg in die Elektronik: ein leicht verständlicher Grundkurs mit vielen praktischen Bauanleitungen, D-85586 Poing, Franzis' Verlag, (19991231), pages 4-7 - 18-37, ISBN 3-7723-5544-7, XP055018026 [Y] 1-10 * page 4 - page 7 * * page 18 - page 37 * | by applicant | WO2005097439 | WO2009059786 | WO2010063462 | WO2011038788 |