EP2565199 - Multiple orthogonal labelling of oligonucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg (Rektorat) Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoch, Juliane Obere Seegasse 42 69124 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Jäschke Andres In der Neckarhelle 154 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Samanta, Ayan Eichendorffstrasse 3 68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Wiessler, Manfred Wilhelm-Mayer-Str.2 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007142.0 | 02.09.2011 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565199 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrfache orthogonale Markierung von Oligonukleotiden | [2013/10] | English: | Multiple orthogonal labelling of oligonucleotides | [2013/10] | French: | Étiquetage multiple orthogonal d'oligonucléotides | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2011095336 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13; | [AD] - PHILIPP M E GRAMLICH ET AL, "Click Click Click: Single to Triple Modification of DNA", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, vol. 47, no. 18, doi:10.1002/ANIE.200705664, ISSN 1433-7851, (20080101), pages 3442 - 3444, (20080328), XP007916867 [AD] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200705664 | [A] - EDUARDO PAREDES ET AL, "Click Chemistry for Rapid Labeling and Ligation of RNA", CHEMBIOCHEM, (20110103), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1002/cbic.201000466, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 125 - 131, XP055013725 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.201000466 | [A] - SAMUEL H. WEISBROD ET AL, "Novel strategies for the site-specific covalent labelling of nucleic acids", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20080101), no. 44, doi:10.1039/b809528k, ISSN 1359-7345, page 5675, XP055020741 [A] 1-13 * page 5679 - page 5682 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b809528k | by applicant | - WEISBROD, S.H., MARX, A., CHEM. COMMUN., (2008), pages 5675 - 5685 | - KOIZUMI, M. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 7059 - 7071 | - VENKATESAN, N. ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 10, pages 1973 - 1991 | - BEAUCAGE, S.L., LYER, P.R., TETRAHEDRON, (1993), pages 6123 - 6194 | - OMUMI, A. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2011), vol. 133, pages 42 - 50 | - SAUER, J., LANG, D., ANGEW. CHEM., (1964), vol. 76, page 603 | - SAUER, J. ET AL., CHEM. BER., (1965), vol. 98, pages 1435 - 1445 | - SEELIG, B. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1997), vol. 38, pages 7729 - 7732 | - SEELIG, B., JASCHKE, A., CHEM. BIOL., (1999), vol. 6, pages 167 - 176 | - GRAMLICH, P.M.E. ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (2008), vol. 47, pages 3442 - 3444 | - DENG, X. ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2011), vol. 50, pages 6522 - 6526 | - GUTSMIEDL, K. ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2009), vol. 11, pages 2405 - 2408 | - BRAUN K. ET AL., DRUG DES. DEV. THER., (2008), vol. 2, pages 289 - 301 | - PIPKORN, R. ET AL., J. PEPT. SCI., (2009), vol. 15, pages 235 - 241 | - BEST, M., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 48, pages 6571 - 6584 | - HUISGEN, R., PROC. CHEM. SOC. LONDON, (1961), page 357 | - MEIER, H. ET AL., CHEM. BER., (1987), vol. 120, pages 685 - 689 | - ROYZEN, M. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, pages 3760 - 3761 | - DEVARAJ, N. K. ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (2009), vol. 48, pages 7013 - 7016 | - SAUER, J. ET AL., EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), pages 2885 - 2896 | WO2011EP00491 | EP20110175266 |