EP2428947 - Terminal and contents sharing method for terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Hyoyoung LG Village Apt. 108-1502 Mullae-Dong 3-ga Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yun, Jungjae Villa 301, 105-61 Bulgwang 2-Dong Eunpyeong-Gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Song, Jungeun Daewoo Samhwan Apt. 108-401 Dongchun 3-Dong Yeonsu-Gu Incheon / KR | 04 /
Kim, Hansu 504, 5th floor 27/1, 1129-3 Guro-Dong Guro-Gu Seoul / KR | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007191.7 | 05.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | KR20100088129 | 08.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100088129 | KR20100090782 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100090782 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428947 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2428947 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/14, G06F3/14, G06F13/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (EP,US);
G09G2340/145 (EP,US);
G09G2370/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endgerät und Verfahren zum gemeinsamen Nutzen von Inhalten für ein Endgerät | [2012/11] | English: | Terminal and contents sharing method for terminal | [2012/11] | French: | Terminal et procédé de parage de contenus pour terminal | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 08.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/05] | 19.10.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/05] | Appeal following examination | 28.12.2015 | Appeal received No. T1104/16 | 29.02.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005091610 (FREI SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0068] *; | [XYI]US2010138780 (MARANO ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0163] * [Y] 6 [I] 12,13; | [X]EP1858238 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0098] *; | [XY]WO2006043977 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,14,15 * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 21; figures 1-13,15 * * page 13, line 9 - page 16, line 23 * [Y] 6; | [Y]WO2009036366 (PANASONIC AVIONICS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0085] *; | [A]US2008165153 (PLATZER ANDREW EMILIO [US], et al) [A] 12,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0169] * |