EP2570190 - Spray nozzle for dispensing a fluid and sprayer comprising such a spray nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bó, Paolo Dal Siegfriedstrasse 104 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2013/12] | Application number, filing date | 11007522.3 | 15.09.2011 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570190 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/34 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
B05B1/3415 (EP,CN,US);
B05B1/3431 (EP,CN,US);
B65D83/753 (EP,CN,US);
G06F30/23 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sprühdüse zum Abgeben einer Flüssigkeit und Sprüheinrichtung, die eine solche Sprühdüse umfasst | [2013/12] | English: | Spray nozzle for dispensing a fluid and sprayer comprising such a spray nozzle | [2013/12] | French: | Buse de pulvérisation pour distribuer un fluide et pulvérisateur comportant une telle buse de pulvérisation | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5335858 (DUNNING WALTER B [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11,15 * column 8, line 23 - column 15, line 33; figure - * [Y] 5; | [X]GB2293336 (AFA PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,15 * page 7, line 1 - page 13, line 13; figure - *; | [Y]WO03015929 (AXAIR AG [CH], et al) [Y] 5* page 9, line 7 - page 9, line 11; figure 1 *; | [X]WO03061839 (VERBENA CORP N V [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,8,15 * page 5, line 20 - page 10, line 26; figure - *; | [X]US2007018017 (TILTON CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0100]; figure - * |