EP2423296 - Use of a lubricating oil composition for machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | Lubricating oil composition for machine tools | ||
[2013/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Oil Corporation 3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8412 / JP | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tagawa, Kazuo c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 02 /
Shimomura, Yuji c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Ken c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 04 /
Takigawa, Katsuya c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 05 /
Konishi, Shozaburo c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 06 /
Yoshida, Toshio c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 07 /
Mitsumoto, Shinichi c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 08 /
Akiyama, Eiji c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 09 /
Shibata, Junichi c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 10 /
Suda, Satoshi c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 11 /
Yokota, Hideo c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 12 /
Hata, Masahiro c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 13 /
Hoshino, Hiroyuki c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | 14 /
Nakao, Hajime c/o Nippon Oil Corporation 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007765.8 | 03.07.2007 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | JP20060187064 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187064 | JP20060187070 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187070 | JP20060187072 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187072 | JP20060187076 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187076 | JP20060187096 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187096 | JP20060187107 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187107 | JP20060187099 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187099 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423296 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10M171/00, C10M101/02, C10M169/04, C21D1/58, C10M127/04, C10M129/06, C10M129/26, C10M129/54, C10M129/68, C10M133/12, C10M135/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
C10M171/008 (EP,US);
C10M101/02 (EP,US);
C10M107/02 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M2203/06 (EP,US);
C10M2203/065 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,US);
C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/04 (EP,US);
C10M2207/042 (EP,US);
C10M2207/10 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/144 (EP,US);
C10M2207/24 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2207/28 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2207/40 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2219/024 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/066 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2219/082 (EP,US);
C10M2219/084 (EP,US);
C10M2219/085 (EP,US);
C10M2219/086 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/043 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2020/013 (EP,US);
C10N2020/015 (EP,US);
C10N2020/017 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/065 (EP,US);
C10N2020/071 (EP,US);
C10N2020/101 (EP,US);
C10N2020/103 (EP,US);
C10N2020/106 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/08 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,US);
C10N2030/30 (EP,US);
C10N2030/74 (EP,US);
C10N2030/76 (EP,US);
C10N2040/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/22 (EP,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,US);
C10N2040/247 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2080/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2205/024, C10M2205/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Schmierölzusammensetzung für Maschinenwerkzeuge | [2013/02] | English: | Use of a lubricating oil composition for machine tools | [2013/02] | French: | Utilisation d'une composition d'huile lubrifiante pour machines-outils | [2013/02] |
Former [2012/09] | Schmierölzusammensetzung für Maschinenwerkzeuge | ||
Former [2012/09] | Lubricating oil composition for machine tools | ||
Former [2012/09] | Composition d'huile lubrifiante pour machines-outils | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 23.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07768075.9 / EP2039746 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070768075) is 17.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006057292 (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1; tables 1-6 *; | [E]EP1816183 (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0112]; examples 1-6; claim 1; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US2001044389 (KOMIYA KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]WO02070636 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1 * page 15, line 5 - page 17, line 10; examples 1-4,6; tables 3,4 *; | [A]US2004118744 (DANIEL MERVYN FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1 * cited in the International Search Report; paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0050]; tables 4,5,6 * | by applicant | JPH0827478 | JPH0827479 | JPH1046168 | JPH1046169 | JP2000104084 | JP2000169868 | JP2000169869 | JPH07252489 | JPH0468082 | JP2000303086 | JP2002129180 | JP2002129181 | JPH10273685 | JP2003165994 | JPH05279730 | JPS5767693 | JPS5174005 | JPH08134488 | JPH08209175 | JPH11209775 | - SAWA M., NIWA M., MURAKAMI Y., ZEOLITES, (1990), vol. 10, page 532 | - KARGE H.G., DONDUR V., J.PHYS.CHEM, (1990), vol. 94, page 765 | - JAPANESE SOCIETY OF TRIBOLOGIST, TRIBOLOGY CONFERENCE, PLENARY LECTURE TOKYO, (1999), page 5D17 |