EP2572585 - Transportation device with star wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2014/42] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Westerbachstrasse 45 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waldstädt, Manfred Budenheimerstrasse 19 55124 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Reiter, Detlef Wallauer Weg 13 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2016/34] |
Former [2013/13] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007838.3 | 26.09.2011 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2572585 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572585 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A22C15/00 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A22C15/001 (EP,US);
A22C11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2013/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung mit Sternrädern | [2013/13] | English: | Transportation device with star wheels | [2013/13] | French: | Dispositif de transport avec roues en étoile | [2013/13] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2011 | AL | 24.08.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | IE | 26.09.2016 | LU | 26.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | FR | 24.10.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GB | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
FR | 24.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3806467 (JKL ROHEMA MASCHINENBAU GMBH) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 53 *; | [A]DE102006054039 (JAHNS MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0037] *; | [A]EP1985185 (TIPPER TIE ALPINA AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0025] *; | [A]EP2103221 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0085] *; | [A]EP2156743 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0063] *; | [A]EP2241188 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0068] * | by applicant | DE3806467 |