EP2578539 - Carbon encapsulated metal oxide nanocomposite, method for its preparation and its use in Li-ion batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fichtner, Maximilian Röhlichstr. 31 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Horst Berggarten 14a 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
Prakash, Raju Albert-Einstein-Str. 2 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Gärtner, Stephan Innovationsmanagement Postfach 3640 76021 Karlsruhe / DE | [2013/15] | Application number, filing date | 11008085.0 | 06.10.2011 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578539 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2578539 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/08, C09C1/24 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A61K33/26 (US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K9/5107 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B13/18 (US);
C01G49/08 (EP,US);
C09C1/24 (EP,US);
H01F1/01 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2004/86 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C01P2006/42 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/623 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | In Kohlenstoff eingekapseltes Metalloxid-Nanokomposit, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dessen Verwendung in Li-Ionen-Akkus | [2013/15] | English: | Carbon encapsulated metal oxide nanocomposite, method for its preparation and its use in Li-ion batteries | [2013/15] | French: | Nanocomposite d'oxyde métallique encapsulé au carbone, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation dans les batteries au lithium-ion | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2011 | AL | 27.08.2014 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | RS | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | IE | 06.10.2014 | LU | 06.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.10.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MK | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.10.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.10.2011 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
LU | 06.10.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011104553 (POL VILAS G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0032] - [0051]; figure 3; examples 1-3 * [I] 7; | [X]US2010035750 (YANG CHIA-MIN [TW], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0009] - [0033] - [0038] - [0042]; figure 4 *; | [XAY] - VINEET PANCHAL ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of carbon coated nanoparticles produced by a continuous low-pressure plasma process", JOURNAL OF NANOPARTICLE RESEARCH ; AN INTERDISCIPLINARY FORUM FOR NANOSCALE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20110306), vol. 13, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S11051-011-0305-3, ISSN 1572-896X, pages 3825 - 3833, XP019937353 [X] 1,5,14 * the whole document * [A] 6-10 [Y] 11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11051-011-0305-3 | [YA] - JULIANA C. TRISTÃO ET AL, "Facile preparation of carbon coated magnetic Fe3O4 particles by a combined reduction/CVD process", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, (20110501), vol. 46, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.materresbull.2011.01.008, ISSN 0025-5408, pages 748 - 754, XP055019054 [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.materresbull.2011.01.008 | [Y] - LIU H ET AL, "Magnetite/carbon core-shell nanorods as anode materials for lithium-ion batteries", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2008.09.036, ISSN 1388-2481, (20081201), pages 1879 - 1882, (20081004), XP025679956 [Y] 11,12 * "Experimental", "Results and discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2008.09.036 | [A] - C.F. WANG ET AL, "Solid-Phase Synthesis of Carbon-Encapsulated Magnetic Nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (20070503), vol. 111, no. 17, doi:10.1021/jp0707283, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 6303 - 6307, XP055018980 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp0707283 | by applicant | - B. BANOV, L. LJUTZKANOV, I. DIMITROV, A. TRIFONOVA, H. VASILCHINA, A. ALEKSANDROVA, A. MOCHILOV, B. T. HANG, S. OKADA, J. I. YAMAK, J. NANOSCI. NANOTECH, (2008), pages 591 - 94 | - H. LIU, G. WANG, J. WANG, D. WEXLER, ELECTROCHEM. COMMUN., (2008), pages 1879 - 82 | - T. MURALIGANTH, A.V. MURUGAN, A. MANTHIRAM, CHEM.COMMUN., (2009), pages 7360 - 62 | - S. WANG, J. ZHANG, C. CHEN, J. POWER SOURCES, (2010), vol. 195, pages 5379 - 81 | - P. LIAN, X. ZHU, H. XIANG, Z. LI, W. YANG, H. WANG, ELECTROCHIM. ACT, (2010), pages 834 - 40 | - S. SONG, R. RAO, H. YANG, H. LIU, A. ZHANG, NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), page 185602 | - H. HE, L. HUANG, J. S. CAI, X. M. ZHENG, S. G. SUN, ELECTROCHIM. ACTA, (2010), vol. 55, pages 1140 - 44 | - M. ZHANG, D. LEI, X. YIN, L. CHEN, Q. LI, Y. WANG, T. WANG, J. MATER. CHEM., (2010), vol. 20, pages 5538 - 43 | - G. ZHOU, D.-W. WANG, F. LI, L. ZHANG, N. LI, Z.-S. WU, L. WEN, G. Q. LU, H.-M. CHENG, CHEM. MATER., (2010), vol. 22, pages 5306 - 13 | - C. BAN, Z. WU, D. T. GILLASPIE, L. CHEN, Y. YAN, J. L. BLACKBRURN, A. C. DILLON, ADV. MATER., (2010), vol. 22, pages E145 - 49 | - L. JI, Z. TAN, T. KUYKENDALL, S. ALONI, S. XUN, E. LIN, V. BATTAGLIA, Y. ZHANG, PHYS. CHEM. CHEM. PHYS., (2011), vol. 13, pages 7170 - 77 | - J.-Z. WANG, C. ZHONG, D. WEXLER, N.H. IDRIS, Z.-X. WANG, L.-Q. CHEN, H.-K. LIU, CHEM. EUR. J., (2011), vol. 17, pages 661 - 667 | - S. JIN, H. DENG, D. LONG, X. LIU, L. ZHAN, X. LIANG, W. QIAO, L. LING, J. POWER SOURCES, (2011), vol. 196, pages 3887 - 3893 |