EP2404561 - Device for removing blood clots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phenox GmbH Lise-Meitner-Allee 31 44801 Bochum / DE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hannes, Ralf Kuithanstraße 75 44137 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
Henkes, Hans Dr. Hauptmannsreute 39 70192 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Miloslavski, Elina Dr. Hauptmannsreute 39 70192 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Monstadt, Hermann Dr. Haarstraße 61 44797 Bochum / DE | [2012/16] |
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
Hannes, Ralf Kuithanstraße 75 44137 Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
Henkes, Hans Dr. Hauptmannsreute 23 70192 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
Miloslavski, Elina Dr. Hauptmannsreute 39 70192 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
Monstadt, Hermann Dr. Haarstraße 61 44797 Bochum / DE | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) 44787 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008119.7 | 22.08.2005 | [2012/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041040868 | 23.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004040868 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404561 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2404561 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404561 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/221 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0216 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22001 (US);
A61B2017/22034 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22038 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22042 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entfernung von Thromben | [2012/02] | English: | Device for removing blood clots | [2012/02] | French: | Dispositif de suppression de thrombi | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 17.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05777177.6 / EP1885257 | Divisional application(s) | EP15161473.2 / EP2926747 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050777177) is 17.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees PL, EE, TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2005 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | AT | 22.08.2015 | IE | 22.08.2015 | LU | 22.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
AT | 22.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002072764 (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * figures 10-14 *; | [X]WO02055146 (MICROVENTION INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11,13,14 * figure 24A *; | [X]DE3921071 (RUPPRECHT HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,12,13 * figures 5,6 *; | [I]US5899850 (OUCHI TERUO [JP]) [I] 1,13,14 * figures 1,35,36 *; | [XP]US2004199202 (DUBRUL WILLIAM [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,8,11,13 * figures 14,21F-21H * | by applicant | US6245089 | US5171233 | US2002049452 | - THOMAS E. MAYER ET AL., STROKE, (2002), page 2232 |