EP2584062 - Sputter target and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Heraeus Materials Technology GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog, Andreas Holunderweg 49 63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
Schultheis, Markus Am Rausch 22 36103 Flieden / DE | 03 /
Schneider-Betz, Sabine Oisterwijker Strasse 51 63303 Dreieich / DE | 04 /
Schlott, Martin, Dr. Scharfensteiner Strasse 33 63075 Offenbach / DE | 05 /
Dewald, Wilma Schunterstrasse 56 38106 Braunschweig / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwalt Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2013/17] | Brand, Normen Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008408.4 | 19.10.2011 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584062 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C23C14/34 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C23C14/0089 (EP);
C23C14/083 (EP);
C23C14/3414 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sputtertarget und seine Verwendung | [2013/17] | English: | Sputter target and its application | [2013/17] | French: | Cible de circuits et son utilisation | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2116631 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7,11 * column 3, paragraph 15 - column 4, paragraph 24 * * column 7, paragraph 42 *; | [A]WO03066928 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,11 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 28 * * page 4, lines 20-34 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 2 *; | [A]WO2009133076 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC A CORP O [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 1-11,30-32 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 23 *; | [A] - KUBART T ET AL, "Influence of the target composition on reactively sputtered titanium oxide films", VACUUM, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 83, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.VACUUM.2009.03.026, ISSN 0042-207X, (20090616), pages 1295 - 1298, (20090328), XP026152057 [A] 1 * page 1296, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vacuum.2009.03.026 | by applicant | US5976639 | US6387576 | JPH07233469 | US6193856 |