EP2447035 - Injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, LTD. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hiroshi c/o Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. Chiba Works, 731-1 Naganumahara-cho Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | 02 /
Tsunemi, Kouki c/o Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. Chiba Works, 731-1 Naganumahara-cho Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | 03 /
Abe, Yoshifuru c/o Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. Chiba Works, 731-1 Naganumahara-cho Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 11008714.5 | 31.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20100245604 | 01.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010245604 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447035 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/76, G05B19/414 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B29C45/762 (EP);
G05B19/4144 (EP);
B29C2945/76929 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spritzgiessmaschine | [2012/18] | English: | Injection molding machine | [2012/18] | French: | Machine de moulage par injection | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2009241540 (YUSHIN SEIKI KK) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0016]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003222615 (AONO RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0029] , [0090] - [0092] *; | [X]EP0643472 (PROCONTROL AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 26 - line 34 * * column 9, line 19 - line 36 * | by applicant | JP2006262636 |