EP2439730 - Independent mapping of portions of color image data to pixel sub-components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, William Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
Duggan, Michael Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
Keely, Leroy B. Jr. Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
Hitchcock, Gregory C. Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
Whitted, Turner J. Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009240.0 | 07.10.1999 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | US19980168012 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 168012 | US19990240654 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 240654 | US19990414148 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: US 414148 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439730 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G09G5/28, G09G3/36 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G5/24 (EP,US);
G09G5/28 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0443 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2012/15] | Title | German: | Unabhängiges Abbilden von Teilen von Farbbilddaten auf Pixelunterkomponenten | [2012/15] | English: | Independent mapping of portions of color image data to pixel sub-components | [2012/15] | French: | Mise en correspondance indépendante de parties de données d'images en couleur pour sous-composants de pixels | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 07.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2017 | 04.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/17] | 16.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99953110.6 / EP1125271 | Divisional application(s) | EP12008233.4 / EP2579246 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0313329 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 6,14 * abstract *; column 1, line 1 - line 43 ** column 3, line 19 - line 56; figures 1-2B *; | [Y]US5334996 (TANIGAKI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 25; figure 2 *; | [XY]US5341153 (BENZSCHAWEL TERRY L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11,12,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 58 * * column 3, lines 4-14 * * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 21; figures 1-4c * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 2; figures 5a-8 * [Y] 2,5,6,10,13,14; | [Y]EP0772144 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 5,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 41; figures 2a-2c *; | [Y]JPH10186315 (SHARP KK) [Y] 2,10 * abstract *; | [L]US6256004 (IZUMI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [L] 2,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 4; figure 1 * * column 9, line 28 - line 47; figure 3 * * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 43; figures 8-11 * * column 14, line 47 - line 60; figure 10 * |