EP2479425 - Method for monitoring the static and/or dynamic stability of a wind energy assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordex Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drossel, Detlef Parallelstrasse 8b 22851 Norderstedt / DE | 02 /
Harms, Ulrich Jaspersdiek 31 22399 Hamburg / DE | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2017/10] |
Former [2012/30] | Schildberg, Peter Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009426.5 | 29.11.2011 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | DE20101053523 | 04.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010053523 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2479425 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2479425 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479425 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F03D17/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
F05B2270/334 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | F03D7/00, F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2012/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung einer statischen und/oder dynamischen Stabilität einer Windenergieanlage | [2012/30] | English: | Method for monitoring the static and/or dynamic stability of a wind energy assembly | [2012/30] | French: | Procédé de surveillance d'une stabilité statique et/ou dynamique d'une éolienne | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | MT | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | GB | 29.11.2017 | IE | 29.11.2017 | LU | 29.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
GB | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US6891280 (SIEGFRIEDSEN SONKE [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,7,9-11; | [A]US2009185901 (NIELSEN THOMAS STEINICHE BJERTRUP [DK], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0084] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE20221562U (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE10065314 (IGUS INGENIEURGEMEINSCHAFT UMW [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] * * figures 1-9 *; | [A] - CHIA CHEN CIANG ET AL, "TOPICAL REVIEW; Structural health monitoring for a wind turbine system: a review of damage detection methods", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20081013), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/19/12/122001, ISSN 0957-0233, page 122001, XP020144300 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [04.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/19/12/122001 | by applicant | DE20221562U | EP2103915 | EP2063110 | DE102007063082 | DE2823525 | DE19739164 | EP1959134 | EP1643122 | US7400055 | US6891280 |