EP2458750 - Optical fiber delivery system for delivering optical short pulses and optical fiber delivery method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Masato OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
Taira, Kenji OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2012/22] | 01 /
Fujiwara, Masato c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya, 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Taira, Kenji c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya, 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009469.5 | 30.11.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | JP20100267519 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010267519 | JP20100293572 | 28.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010293572 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2458750 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2458750 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155, H01S3/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
H04B10/508 (US);
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H01S3/0092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H04B10/155 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Glasfaser-Abgabesystem zum Abgeben von kurzen Lichtimpulsen und Glasfaser-Abgabeverfahren | [2012/22] | English: | Optical fiber delivery system for delivering optical short pulses and optical fiber delivery method | [2012/22] | French: | Système de délivrance de fibres optiques pour fournir des impulsions optiques courtes et procédé de fourniture de fibres optiques | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 03.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9949297 (PICOMETRIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, lines 1-9; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 6-8 * * page 7, lines 17-21 * * page 8, lines 21-24 * [A] 9-15; | [YA]WO03096495 (UNIV COLORADO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 26; figure 3 * * page 11, line 16 - page 13, line 26 *[A] 9-15; | [YA]US2008260319 (TAIRA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0072] - [0081]; figure 1 * [A] 9-15 | by applicant | US6249630 | JP2008268589 | - G. P. AGRAWAL, Nonlinear fiber optics, ACADEMIC PRESS |