EP2468316 - Surface coating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | Surface coating method and coating device | ||
[2016/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Medical GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 8/13 61273 Wehrheim / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Sebastian, Dr. Gamstädter Weg 11 99092 Erfurt / DE | 02 /
Büchner, Hubert, Dr. Mörickestrasse 13 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Heraeus IP Heraeus Business Solutions GmbH Intellectual Property Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Heraeus IP Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Panten, Kirsten Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009582.5 | 05.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20101055562 | 23.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010055562 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468316 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468316 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/54, A61L31/16, B05C1/06, B05D1/28 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
B05C1/06 (US);
B05D1/28 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2420/02 (EP,US);
B05C17/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | A61L27/28, A61L31/08, A61L31/16, B05D1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsvorrichtung | [2016/02] | English: | Surface coating device | [2016/02] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/26] | Beschichtungsverfahren und Beschichtungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2012/26] | Surface coating method and coating device | ||
Former [2012/26] | Procédé de revêtement et dispositif de revêtement | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 21.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2011 | AL | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | MT | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 05.12.2016 | LU | 05.12.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008260936 (HEIDNER MATT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12,14,24,25 * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 3, paragraph 39; figures 1a, 1d,9,6a-6b * * page 3, paragraph 46; claims 1-19 * [A] 6,11,13,20-23,26,27 [I] 15-19; | [XAI]WO2008086794 (HEMOTEQ AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10,12,14,22-25 * page 10, line 5; figure 5; claims 1-3,30-42 * [A] 3,9,11,20,21,26,27 [I] 15-19; | [XAI]WO2005042045 (BLUE MEMBRANES GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,10,24,25 * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 67; figure 14 * [A] 26,27 [I] 16-19; | [XAI]US7563324 (CHEN YUNG-MING [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,10,14,22,23,25 * figure 1; claims 1-4, 9, 12,15 * [A] 26,27 [I] 16,17 | by applicant | EP0623349 | EP1470829 | EP1374923 | DE10142465 | DE4404018 |