EP2466090 - Assembly with two independent turbochargers for combustion engines and method for operating two turbochargers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adamol, Abdullah Oststrasse 4/1 74072 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
Schwämmle, Heiko Zuckerweg 3 74254 Offenau / DE | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Lehle, Josef AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2012/25] | Application number, filing date | 11009806.8 | 13.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | DE20101054959 | 17.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010054959 | [2012/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466090 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2466090 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/44, F02B37/007, F02M35/10, F02M35/02 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
F02B33/44 (EP,US);
F02B37/007 (EP,US);
F02M35/0215 (EP,US);
F02M35/10019 (EP,US);
F02M35/10157 (EP,US);
F02M35/10308 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | Anordnung mit zwei voneinander unabhängigen Turbolader für Verbrennungskraftmaschine sowie Verfahren zum Betreiben zweier Turbolader | [2012/25] | English: | Assembly with two independent turbochargers for combustion engines and method for operating two turbochargers | [2012/25] | French: | Agencement à deux turbosoufflantes indépendantes l'une de l'autre pour moteur à combustion interne et procédé de fonctionnement de deux turbosoufflantes | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2011 | AL | 26.02.2014 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | ES | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | RS | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MK | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
RS | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
ES | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5136988 (FROHBERG DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 9; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 4,6; | [XI]JPH0589863U (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR COMPANY) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figure 3 * [I] 4,6; | [XI]WO2004013472 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figure 2; claims 1,5,7,9 * [I] 4,6; | [A]EP1643102 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | DE3633405 | DE102005054249 | DE102007014319 |