EP2466346 - Manufacturing method of diffraction grating in CdTe or CdZnTe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sukegawa, Takashi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sugiyama, Shigeru c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Weser, Thilo Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Weser, Thilo Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009814.2 | 13.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | JP20100282546 | 20.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010282546 | JP20110151277 | 07.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011151277 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466346 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2466346 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
G02B5/1852 (EP,US);
G02B5/1857 (US);
G02B5/1861 (EP,US);
C01B19/007 (EP,US);
H01L31/03925 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Diffraktionsgitter in CdTe oder CdZnTe | [2012/25] | English: | Manufacturing method of diffraction grating in CdTe or CdZnTe | [2012/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de réseau de diffraction en CdTe ou CdZnTe | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13004129.6 / EP2667228 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2011 | AL | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | SM | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | RS | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IE | 13.12.2013 | LU | 13.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MK | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
TR | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/31] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003075622 (TOSHIBA CORP) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0021] , [0022]; figures 1,6,7,9; claim 1 *; | [A]US4475792 (SICA JR LOUIS [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 13-23; figure 1 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A]US4376663 (WANG CHENG-CHI, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 4-54; figure 2 * | [A] - P Kuzmenko ET AL, "High efficiency germanium immersion gratings", UCRL-CONF-221103, Opto-Mechanical Technologies for Astronomy, Orlando, FL, United States, INET, (20060505), pages 1 - 16, URL: https://e-reports-ext.llnl.gov/pdf/333379.pdf, (20120419), XP055024985 [A] 1-6 * Section 2.2 and figures 3,9,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.670565 | [A] - H. J. MCSKIMIN ET AL, "Elastic Moduli of Cadmium Telluride", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19620101), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1063/1.1728527, ISSN 0021-8979, page 56, XP055024930 [A] 1-6 * page 56, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1728527 |