EP2468545 - Tensioning bow for a foldable vehicle roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | Tensioning bow for a foldable vehicle roof | ||
[2014/48] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Car Top Systems GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 59 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katrini, Waleri Robert-Berndt-Str. 13 01257 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Papendorf, Marcus Ulrich-Hahn-Str. 12 74357 Bönnigheim / DE | 03 /
Klein, Berthold Bleiche 26 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | 04 /
Liebhardt, Randolf Goethestr. 10 71120 Grafenau / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Völger, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Völger, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11009872.0 | 15.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20101056247 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010056247 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468545 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468545 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2468545 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/06, B60J7/12 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B60J7/061 (EP,US);
B60J7/1226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faltverdeck für ein Fahrzeug mit einem Spannbügel | [2014/48] | English: | Tensioning bow for a foldable vehicle roof | [2017/47] | French: | Arceau de tension pour un toit pliable de véhicule | [2017/47] |
Former [2012/26] | Spannbügel für ein Faltverdeck eines Fahrzeugs | ||
Former [2012/26] | Tensioning bow for a foldable vehicle roof | ||
Former [2012/26] | Arceau de tension pour un toit pliable de véhicule | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 27.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Webasto-Edscha Cabrio GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Webasto-Edscha Cabrio GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | 02.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2017 | 13.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.06.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | RS | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | AT | 15.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
AT | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
AT | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]DE19731330 (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [XD] 1,3,4,7,10 * the whole document * [I] 2,5,6,8,9; | [XI]DE102004020757 (OPEN AIR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,10 * the whole document * [I] 2,5,6,8,9; | [A]DE4129493 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10359513 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 12 *; | [A]EP2210754 (MAGNA CAR SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009000226 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19731330 | DE10104522 | DE102004020007 | GB360415 | Opposition | US2694598 | DE102004020757 | DE19604855 | DE19638846 | DE19731330 | DE102008036632 | - Renz, Sebastian, "Fiat 500 C-Fahrbericht" 06.09.2009, ¬gefunden 09.11.2015| Fundstelle: ¬http://www.auto-motor-und-sport.de/fahrberichte/fiat-500-c-fahrbericht-1346431.html| |