EP2469054 - Drive with a combustion engine and an expansion machine with gas recirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reuss, Thomas Am alten Berg 3 74196 Neuenstadt / DE | 02 /
Fessler, Marc Holderstrasse 32 74246 Eberstadt / DE | 03 /
Dawidziak, Johannes Drosselstrasse 6 97950 Grossrinderfeld / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Lehle, Josef AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 11009894.4 | 15.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20101056238 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010056238 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469054 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469054 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02B21/00, B60K6/12 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B60K6/12 (EP,US);
F02B21/00 (EP,US);
B60K2006/123 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Antrieb mit einer Brennkraftmaschine und einer Expansionsmaschine mit Gasrückführung | [2012/26] | English: | Drive with a combustion engine and an expansion machine with gas recirculation | [2012/26] | French: | Entraînement doté d'un moteur à combustion interne et machine d'expansion équipée d'un retour de gaz | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MK | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | RS | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | SM | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | NO | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MK | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RS | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19600910 (AUGUSTIN ULRICH DR ING [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102007059145 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]DE102007033693 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]FR2831609 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 24 - line 26; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE102008008723 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2428653 (MA THOMAS TSOI HEI [GB]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004106713 | US2006052930 | WO2009036992 | EP1308614 | FR2836181 |