EP2447978 - Arc source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 1A 9477 Trübbach / CH | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramm, Dr. Jürgen Mühlebündtestraße 12 7304 Maienfeld / CH | 02 /
Gstoehl, Oliver Prafatell 40 LI-9496 Balzers / LI | 03 /
Widrig, Benno Rheinstraße 13 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | 04 /
Lendi, Daniel Staatsstraße 60 9472 Grabs / CH | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 11009905.8 | 01.03.2006 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | CH20050051805 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: CH 518052005 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447978 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447978 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/34, H01J37/32, C23C14/32, C23C14/02, C23C14/06, C23C14/08, F01D5/28, C23C28/04 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
C23C14/00 (KR);
C23C14/024 (EP,US);
C23C14/0641 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/081 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/28 (KR);
C23C14/32 (KR);
C23C14/325 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
H01J37/32 (KR);
H01J37/32055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H01J37/34, C23C14/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | Arcquelle | [2012/18] | English: | Arc source | [2012/18] | French: | Source d'arc | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06705363.7 / EP1869690 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060705363) is 21.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]DE4401986 (DRESDEN VAKUUMTECH GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1,2,6 * column 5, lines 16-60; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 3-5,7; | [A]DE3731127 (VAC TEC SYST [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 30-56; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US3836451 (SNAPER A) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 75 - column 4, line 58; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2005005684 (CHEMFILT R & D AB [SE], et al) [Y] 7 * page 23, lines 2-19; figure 3 *; | [Y]JP2004076069 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0040] - [0042] - [0051] *; | [X]US5645698 (OKANO MANABU [JP]) [X] 8,9 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 8, line 22; figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [X]US6007879 (SCHOLL RICHARD A [US]) [X] 10 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 65; figure 1 *; | [A] - HORWITZ C M ET AL, "A switching power supply for DC sputtering", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19800901), vol. 13, no. 9, doi:10.1088/0022-3735/13/9/030, ISSN 0022-3735, pages 1021 - 1023, XP020016287 [A] 8-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/13/9/030 | by applicant | WO02070776 | WO03057939 | US6361663 | US5518597 | DE4401986 | US6602390 | EP1186681 |