EP2610181 - Method for customising cartons with an overprint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehnhoff, Ingo Grüner Weg 3 18347 Dierhagen / DE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 11010225.8 | 27.12.2011 | [2013/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610181 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2610181 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/00, G06Q30/02, B65B61/02, B41J11/00, B41J13/00, // B65B59/00 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B41J11/001 (EP);
B41J11/008 (EP);
B41J13/0063 (EP);
B41J13/0072 (EP);
B65B11/004 (EP);
B65B61/025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | B65B11/00, G09F23/00, G06Q30/02, B65B61/02, B41J3/28, // B65B59/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Individualisieren von Kartons durch einen Aufddruck | [2013/27] | English: | Method for customising cartons with an overprint | [2013/27] | French: | Procédé d'individualisation de cartons par une surimpression | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 27.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.12.2011 | AL | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | EE | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | HR | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | LT | 22.01.2014 | LV | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | MK | 22.01.2014 | MT | 22.01.2014 | NL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | RS | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | SM | 22.01.2014 | NO | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.12.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MK | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.12.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
MT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.12.2011 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
SM | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
EE | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
HR | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
LV | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RS | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
NL | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 22.01.2014 | |
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
LT | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 22.01.2014 | |
NO | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5810487 (KANO KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, lines 15-22, 44-57 * * column 4, lines 4-10, 31-34 * * column 5, lines 41-53 * * column 8, lines 32,46-53 * * column 10, lines 33-37 * * column 11, lines 28-33; figures 2-12 *; | [A]US5430992 (OLSON ALLEN L [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 59-67; figure 3 *; | [A]US2010294690 (BUTLER DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0062] - [0063]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2007074412 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 9, lines 28-31 * * page 10, lines 26-28 * * page 11, lines 1-2; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2010017305 (STRODTMAN LAWRENCE EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 25] , [0 48]; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | EP1925573 | US5810487 |