EP2474612 - Affinity separation means, and uses thereof to separate, purify or concentrate a target molecule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University College Dublin, National University of Ireland Dublin Belfield Dublin 4 / IE | For all designated states National Institute for Bioprocessing Research and Training Limited Engineering Building Belfield Dublin 4 / IE | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Gil c/o NOVA UCD Belfield D4 Dublin / IE | 02 /
Muzard, Julien 75 Grove Park Rathmines D6 Dublin / IE | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucey Intellectual Property The Capel Building, Suite 138-139 Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11150252.2 | 05.01.2011 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474612 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Affinitätstrennungsmittel und ihre Verwendungen zur Trennung, Reinigung und Konzentration von Zielmolekülen | [2012/28] | English: | Affinity separation means, and uses thereof to separate, purify or concentrate a target molecule | [2012/28] | French: | Supports de séparation d'affinité, et utilisations associées pour séparer, purifier ou concentrer une molécule cible | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03078451 (NEW CENTURY PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [X] 3,15 * page 8, lines 4-20; figures 9,10 * [I] 2; | [XYI] - SCHOLLE M D ET AL, "In vivo biotinylated proteins as targets for phage-display selection experiments", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20040901), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PEP.2004.05.012, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 243 - 252, XP004523962 [X] 1,8,9,11 * page 246, column r, paragraph l - page 247, column l, line 1; figure 1 * [Y] 4,6 [I] 2,7,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2004.05.012 | [XYI] - KONTHUR Z ET AL, "Automation of phage display for high-throughput antibody development", TARGETS, ELSEVIER, (20020701), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1477-3627(02)02171-2, ISSN 1477-3627, pages 30 - 36, XP004886584 [X] 1,8,9,11,13 * the whole document * [Y] 4 [I] 2,7,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1477-3627(02)02171-2 | [IY] - SHANG H ET AL, The application of magnetic force differentiation for the measurement of the affinity of peptide libraries, JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS MAY 2005 ELSEVIER NL, VOL. 293, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 382 - 388, (200505), XP002636163 [I] 9-11 * page 382, column r, line l - page 384, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 384, column r, paragraph l; figure 1 * [Y] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JMMM.2005.02.035 | [XI] - KIM H J ET AL, "Magnetic bead-based phage anti-immunocomplex assay (PHAIA) for the detection of the urinary biomarker 3-phenoxybenzoic acid to assess human exposure to pyrethroid insecticides", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 386, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2008.12.003, ISSN 0003-2697, (20090301), pages 45 - 52, (20081207), XP025884778 [X] 1,8,9,11 * abstract; page 46, column r, line 27 - page 47, column l, paragraph 2; figure 5 * * page 47, column l, lines 1-3, paragraph 4 * * page 47, column r, lines 1-3, paragraph 2 * [I] 2,7,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2008.12.003 | by applicant | WO03074548 | US5427908 | US5403484 | US5432018 | US5270170 | US4002531 | US5349052 | WO9506058 | WO9832466 | US5612460 | - BENNETT ET AL., SOCIETY FOR APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 83, pages 259 - 265 | - PETRENKO ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 797 - 801 | - DELGADO ET AL., CRIT. REV. THERA. DRUG CARRIER SYS., (1992), vol. 9, pages 249 - 304 | - FRANCIS ET AL., INTER J. OF HEMATOL., (1998), vol. 68, pages 1 - 18 |