EP2347905 - Liquid jetting head unit and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsubaki, Kengo c/o Tohoku Ricoh Co., Ltd 3-1, Shinmeido, Nakanomyo, Shibatamachi Shibata-gun Miyagi 989-1695 / JP | [2013/50] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Tsubaki, Kengo c/o Tohoku Ricoh Co., Ltd 3-1, Shinmeido, Nakanomyo, Shibatamachi Shibata-gun Miyagi 989-1695 / JP | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/50] |
Former [2011/30] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11150263.9 | 05.01.2011 | [2011/30] | Priority number, date | JP20100012227 | 22.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010012227 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2347905 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2347905 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347905 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/185 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/175 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/185 (EP,US);
B41J2202/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstrahlkopfeinheit und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2011/30] | English: | Liquid jetting head unit and image forming apparatus | [2011/30] | French: | Unité de tête d'éjection de liquide et appareil de formation d'images | [2011/30] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 29.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2011 | AL | 11.12.2013 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | HR | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MK | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | RS | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | SM | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | IE | 05.01.2014 | LU | 05.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | NO | 11.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | |
NO | 11.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009066612 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 3 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] * * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]WO2009142889 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]WO2005007415 (XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009126044 | JP2008030333 | JP2006168023 | JP2010012227 |